This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/29/2023 at 05:32:00 (UTC).

PHYSICAL THERAPY NOW HOLDINGS LLC VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/26/2023 PHYSICAL THERAPY NOW HOLDINGS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Silver, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Silver, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Physical Therapy Now Holdings LLC

Assignor

Dania Gonzalez

Defendant

Progressive American Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Geffrard, Markendia H

Defendant Attorney

Million, Andres, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/26/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/26/2023 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/04/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/06/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

06/12/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Notice of Appearance

10/31/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Motion to Dismiss

10/31/2023 - Motion to Dismiss

 

Docket Entries

10/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Progressive American Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120159AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:GEFFRARD, MARKENDIA HP.O. BOX 741214BOYNTON BEACH, FL 33474COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/06/2023REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100038AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:GEFFRARD, MARKENDIA HP.O. BOX 741214BOYNTON BEACH, FL 33474COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:05/31/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less