*************P-24
05/26/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Miami-Dade, Florida
Physical Therapy Now Holdings LLC
Javier Alvares
United Automobile Insurance Company
Geffrard, Markendia H
A Monique Yenke
05/26/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount
05/26/2023 - Statement of Claim
06/02/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
06/06/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued
06/12/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements
07/24/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time
DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: United Automobile Insurance Company
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120125AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:GEFFRARD, MARKENDIA HP.O. BOX 741214BOYNTON BEACH, FL 33474COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/06/2023REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100029AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:GEFFRARD, MARKENDIA HP.O. BOX 741214BOYNTON BEACH, FL 33474COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:05/31/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event
[-] Read Less