This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/15/2023 at 10:57:41 (UTC).

PALM BEACH CHIROPRACTIC & REHABILITATION INC VS ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/18/2023 PALM BEACH CHIROPRACTIC REHABILITATION INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Palm Beach Chiropractic & Rehabilitation Inc

Defendant

Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

Assignee

Wagner, Kenneth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Fischetti

Defendant Attorney

La Montagne, Rachel

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/18/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/18/2023 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/19/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/24/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

05/29/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Notice of Service of Process

06/02/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Appearance

06/22/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Request for Production

06/23/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

06/23/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150150AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:MICHAEL FISCHETTIFISCHETTI LAW GROUP MICHAEL J FISCHETTI, ESQ 7593BOYNTON BEACH FL 33437COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:05/23/2023REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3260386AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:MICHAEL FISCHETTIFISCHETTI LAW GROUP MICHAEL J FISCHETTI, ESQ 7593BOYNTON BEACH FL 33437COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:05/20/2023REGISTER#:326CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less