This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/23/2023 at 21:34:51 (UTC).

THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC VS EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC

AIR QUALITY ASSESSORS OF FLORIDA

Assignor

PUENTES, JOSE

Defendant

EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Plumage, Alexander, ESQ

Defendant Attorney

Lavigne, Donald S

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/24/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/24/2023 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Interrogatory

05/24/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

05/24/2023 - Request for Production

Notice:

05/24/2023 - Notice:

Notice of Unavailability/absence

08/17/2023 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

08/18/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

08/28/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/29/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Order Extending Time for

08/29/2023 - Order Extending Time for

Notice of Service of Process

09/06/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Appearance

09/12/2023 - Notice of Appearance

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Lavigne Donald S; EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3240219AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:PLUMAGE, ALEXANDER, ESQ5200 BLUE LAGOON DRIVE, SUITE 790MIAMI FL 33126COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:08/29/2023REGISTER#:324CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070007AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:PLUMAGE, ALEXANDER, ESQ5200 BLUE LAGOON DRIVE, SUITE 790MIAMI FL 33126COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:06/02/2023REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less