This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/30/2023 at 17:41:23 (UTC).

SHEDDF3-AE, LLC VS MANGARATE FAMILY TRUST DATED AUGUST 21, 2008 ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/01/2023 SHEDDF3-AE, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MANGARATE FAMILY TRUST DATED AUGUST 21, 2008. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHEDDF3-AE, LLC

Defendants

MANGARATE FAMILY TRUST DATED AUGUST 21, 2008

Estate of Jesus A. Gonzalez (The)

Estate of Modesta Gonzalez (The)

City of Miami

Miami-Dade County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Spuches, Christopher B., ESQ

Defendant Attorney

Kohn, Joseph T.

 

Court Documents

Order Setting CM Deadline

08/25/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Order Granting Motion to Dismiss

08/14/2023 - Order Granting Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

08/14/2023 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Notice of Hearing-

08/02/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion to Dismiss

07/06/2023 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Appearance

07/03/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Motion to Dismiss

06/27/2023 - Motion to Dismiss

Service Returned

06/20/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

06/20/2023 - Service Returned

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/09/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/09/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/09/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/09/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/09/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/09/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Lis Pendens

06/01/2023 - Lis Pendens

Complaint

06/01/2023 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/01/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: TUESDAY, AUGUST 15, 2023 AT 8:30 A.M.MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Granting Motion to Dismiss; Book/Page: 33841:4221; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: AUGUST 15, 2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Miami-Dade County

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Kohn Joseph T.; MANGARATE FAMILY TRUST DATED AUGUST 21 2008; Estate of Jesus A. Gonzalez (The)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: City of Miami

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 15.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3060214AMT PAID:$1,922.50NAME:SPUCHES, CHRISTOPHER B., ESQ55 ALHAMBRA PLZ, SUITE 800CORAL GABLES FL 33134-5254COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$1,906.00$1,906.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$7.50$7.503142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$1,922.50RECEIPT DATE:06/02/2023REGISTER#:306CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33734:176; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less