This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/05/2023 at 05:38:17 (UTC).

DAIMLER TRUST VS LUIS GONZALEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/11/2023 DAIMLER TRUST filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against LUIS GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daimler Trust

Defendants

Gonzalez, Luis

JR Auto Export, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul E Wilson (esq)

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/11/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

05/11/2023 - Complaint

Motion for Writ of Replevin

06/28/2023 - Motion for Writ of Replevin

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/28/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/28/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Final Order by Judge

07/02/2023 - Final Order by Judge

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/04/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160113AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:PAUL E WILSON (ESQ)WILSON DALEY, PLLC 1776 N. PINE ISLAND RD, STE 308PLANTATION FL 33322COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:07/04/2023REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Order by Judge; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Order by Judge; Event Type: Event; Comments: WRIT OF REPLEVIN Parties: Gonzalez Luis; JR Auto Export Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Writ of Replevin; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130096AMT PAID:$486.00NAME:PAUL E WILSON (ESQ)WILSON DALEY, PLLC 1776 N. PINE ISLAND RD, STE 308PLANTATION FL 33322COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003134-WRIT (GARD) ADD FE1$85.00$85.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$486.00RECEIPT DATE:05/12/2023REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less