This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/18/2023 at 03:30:10 (UTC).

SPACE COAST CREDIT UNION VS MISAEL GONZALEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 SPACE COAST CREDIT UNION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MISAEL GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Space Coast Credit Union

Defendants

Gonzalez, Misael

Chong Gonzalez, Loyda

Gonzalez, Azael

Machado, Febe

Portella, Alicia

Citimortgage, Inc.,

FIRST FRANKLIN FINANCIAL CORPORATION

Castle Peak 2011-1 REO II,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Grayson, Moises T.

Defendant Attorney

Ciccio, Matthew, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Order to Serve Defendant

06/23/2023 - Order to Serve Defendant

Order Setting CM Deadline

06/21/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Complaint

05/25/2023 - Complaint

Voluntary Dismissal

08/15/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

Motion for Extension of Time

07/14/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Email Notice:

07/11/2023 - Email Notice:

Notice of Appearance

07/11/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Service Returned

06/30/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

06/30/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

06/30/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

06/30/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

06/30/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

06/30/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

06/30/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

06/30/2023 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/08/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/08/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/08/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITH PREJUDICE & DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS Parties: Gonzalez Misael; Chong Gonzalez Loyda; Gonzalez Azael; Machado Febe; Portella Alicia; Citimortgage Inc.; FIRST FRANKLIN FINANCIAL CORPORATION; Castle Peak 2011-1 REO II

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: FIRST FRANKLIN FINANCIAL CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: SERVICEMAIL@ALDRIDGEPITE.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Ciccio Matthew ESQ; FIRST FRANKLIN FINANCIAL CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080143AMT PAID:$936.00NAME:GRAYSON, MOISES T.25 SE 2ND AVE STE 730MIAMI FL 33131-1696COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$25.00$25.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$936.00RECEIPT DATE:05/27/2023REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33726:356; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less