This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/31/2023 at 08:04:17 (UTC).

OLD CUTLER LAKES BY THE BAY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION VS MARILYN CORTEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/27/2023 OLD CUTLER LAKES BY THE BAY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against MARILYN CORTEZ. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLD CUTLER LAKES BY THE BAY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Defendants

CORTEZ, MARILYN

AGUIRRE, ARMANDO

TOWN OF CUTLER BAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adelson, Anthony S.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/27/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

04/27/2023 - Complaint

Lis Pendens

04/28/2023 - Lis Pendens

Order Setting CM Deadline

08/22/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Motion for Extension of Time

08/23/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order Extending Time for

08/24/2023 - Order Extending Time for

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

08/24/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

08/24/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

08/24/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

08/24/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

08/24/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/24/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/24/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/24/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/24/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/24/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3230145AMT PAID:$50.00NAME:ADELSON, ANTHONY S.ANTHONY S. ANDELSON, P.A. 501 GOLDEN ISLES DR, STEHALLANDALE BEACH FL 33009COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$50.00RECEIPT DATE:08/25/2023REGISTER#:323CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 11. Parties: CORTEZ MARILYN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 14. Parties: TOWN OF CUTLER BAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 13.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 12.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: AGUIRRE ARMANDO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: OLD CUTLER LAKES BY THE BAY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110045AMT PAID:$410.00NAME:ADELSON, ANTHONY S.ANTHONY S. ANDELSON, P.A. 501 GOLDEN ISLES DR, STEHALLANDALE BEACH FL 33009COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$410.00RECEIPT DATE:04/29/2023REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33684:4262; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less