This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/25/2023 at 08:42:37 (UTC).

FLORIDA MOBILE GLASS VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/21/2023 FLORIDA MOBILE GLASS filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Florida Mobile Glass

Defendant

Progressive American Insurance Company

Assignee

Delvarin, Yvette

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Emilio R Stillo

Defendant Attorney

Magana, Alejandro

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/21/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

03/21/2023 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

03/27/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/31/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

04/17/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Appearance

05/02/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

05/16/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Voluntary Dismissal

06/26/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33774:4176; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Progressive American Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Progressive American Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140312AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:EMILIO R STILLO7320 GRIFFIN RD STE 203DAVIE FL 33314-4105COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:03/31/2023REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3131735AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:EMILIO R STILLO7320 GRIFFIN RD STE 203DAVIE FL 33314-4105COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:03/24/2023REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 100.01

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less