This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/06/2023 at 17:12:50 (UTC).

ADVANCED HEALTH IMAGING, LLC. VS UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/28/2023 ADVANCED HEALTH IMAGING, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADVANCED HEALTH IMAGING, LLC.

Assignor

RICO, YUBISLEIBY

Defendant

UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sorensen, Jon

Defendant Attorney

Shetty, Ajith

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/28/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

04/28/2023 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Interrogatory

04/28/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

04/28/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

04/28/2023 - Request for Admissions

Notice:

04/28/2023 - Notice:

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/01/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/08/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

06/12/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Answer and Affirmative Defense

08/04/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Stipulation

08/04/2023 - Stipulation

Response to Request for Admissions

08/04/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

Reply

08/14/2023 - Reply

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulation; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020202AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:SORENSEN, JON815 N. HOMESTEAD BLVD., #511HOMESTEAD FL 33030COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/02/2023REGISTER#:302CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130293AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:SORENSEN, JON815 N. HOMESTEAD BLVD., #511HOMESTEAD FL 33030COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:05/02/2023REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less