This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/02/2023 at 11:04:38 (UTC).

ALL X RAY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES CORP VS SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 ALL X RAY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES CORP filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

All X Ray Diagnostic Services Corp

Defendant

Safeco Insurance Company Of America

Assignee

Pedro, Elso

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gonzalez, Neil M

Defendant Attorney

Mellor, Stephen G

 

Court Documents

Motion:

08/24/2023 - Motion:

Motion for Default

08/21/2023 - Motion for Default

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

06/13/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Motion:

08/24/2023 - Motion:

Motion:

08/24/2023 - Motion:

Order for Substitution of Counsel

10/05/2023 - Order for Substitution of Counsel

Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

09/25/2023 - Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

Notice of Appearance

09/20/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Hearing-

09/14/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice:

08/24/2023 - Notice:

Notice of Service of Process

06/27/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/12/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/31/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Request for Admissions

05/25/2023 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

05/25/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

05/25/2023 - Request for Production

Statement of Claim

05/25/2023 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/25/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/27/2023

HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:15AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/27/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order for Substitution of Counsel; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
06/12/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: Safeco Insurance Company Of America

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100280AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:GONZALEZ, NEIL MLAW OFFICE OF GONZALEZ & ASSOCIATES, LLC 3403 NW 8MIAMI FL 33122COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/07/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100453AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:GONZALEZ, NEIL MLAW OFFICE OF GONZALEZ & ASSOCIATES, LLC 3403 NW 8MIAMI FL 33122COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:06/01/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less