This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/18/2023 at 12:26:15 (UTC).

UNLIMITED DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, INC VS INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/03/2023 UNLIMITED DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNLIMITED DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, INC

Defendant

INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

ROMERO, ONASIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brown, Felicia B

Defendant Attorney

Santana, Katherine

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel

08/12/2023 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

08/12/2023 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

08/12/2023 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

08/12/2023 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

08/12/2023 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

08/12/2023 - Motion to Compel

Motion for Sanctions

08/07/2023 - Motion for Sanctions

Motion to Strike

06/06/2023 - Motion to Strike

Answer and Affirmative Defense

06/06/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Motion for Summary Judgment

08/28/2023 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice of Filing:

08/28/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Letter of Correspondence

07/15/2023 - Letter of Correspondence

Notice of Filing:

07/06/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

07/06/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Notice:

06/06/2023 - Notice:

Notice of Filing:

06/06/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Witness and Exhibit List

05/16/2023 - Witness and Exhibit List

Notice of Interrogatory

05/16/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Sanctions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150070AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:BROWN, FELICIA BBROWN LEGAL GROUP, P.A. PO BOX 558427 MIAMI, FLORICOMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:05/04/2023REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150035AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:BROWN, FELICIA BBROWN LEGAL GROUP, P.A. PO BOX 558427 MIAMI, FLORICOMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:05/04/2023REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 3. Parties: INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less