This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 04/22/2023 at 11:28:54 (UTC).

DYNAMIC SPINE AND REHABILITATION CENTER VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/12/2023 DYNAMIC SPINE AND REHABILITATION CENTER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dynamic Spine And Rehabilitation Center

Defendant

Progressive American Insurance Company

Assignee

Torchon, Darlie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Fischetti

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/12/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

04/12/2023 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/14/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/17/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

04/20/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Progressive American Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150097AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:MICHAEL FISCHETTIFISCHETTI LAW GROUP MICHAEL J FISCHETTI, ESQ 7593BOYNTON BEACH FL 33437COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:04/15/2023REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3170086AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:MICHAEL FISCHETTIFISCHETTI LAW GROUP MICHAEL J FISCHETTI, ESQ 7593BOYNTON BEACH FL 33437COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:04/14/2023REGISTER#:317CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less