This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/23/2023 at 03:09:27 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON (THE) VS MARCOS F RODRIGUEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/15/2023 BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON THE filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MARCOS F RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON (THE)

BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE (THE)

Defendants

RODRIGUEZ, MARCOS F

SUNTRUST BANK

RODRIGUEZ, DAISY B

RODRIGUEZ, DAISY

TRUIST BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lauren M. Heggestad

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/15/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

05/15/2023 - Complaint

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

05/15/2023 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Lis Pendens

05/16/2023 - Lis Pendens

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/18/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/18/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/18/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/18/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/18/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/24/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/24/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/24/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/24/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/24/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Final Disposition Document

08/03/2023 - Final Disposition Document

Voluntary Dismissal

08/03/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33827:3234; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITHOUT PREJUDICE Parties: RODRIGUEZ MARCOS F; SUNTRUST BANK; RODRIGUEZ DAISY B; RODRIGUEZ DAISY; TRUIST BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Disposition Document; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 12.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 11.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: RODRIGUEZ DAISY B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: SUNTRUST BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3180298AMT PAID:$1,916.00NAME:LAUREN M. HEGGESTADPO BOX 23028TAMPA FL 33623-2028COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$1,906.00$1,906.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$5.00$5.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$1,916.00RECEIPT DATE:05/17/2023REGISTER#:318CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33712:3213; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less