This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/21/2023 at 15:45:51 (UTC).

OLD CUTLER LAKES BY THE BAY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION VS MARIE M DAHL ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/28/2023 OLD CUTLER LAKES BY THE BAY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against MARIE M DAHL. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLD CUTLER LAKES BY THE BAY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Defendants

DAHL, MARIE M

DAHL, LEONARD V

FOUR BLR DOORS CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adelson, Anthony S.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/28/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

04/28/2023 - Complaint

Lis Pendens

04/28/2023 - Lis Pendens

Order Setting CM Deadline

08/22/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Voluntary Dismissal

09/12/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

Discharge/release of Lis Pendens

09/12/2023 - Discharge/release of Lis Pendens

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3260025AMT PAID:$9.00NAME:ADELSON, ANTHONY S.ANTHONY S. ANDELSON, P.A. 501 GOLDEN ISLES DR, STEHALLANDALE BEACH FL 33009COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$9.00RECEIPT DATE:09/14/2023REGISTER#:326CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Discharge/release of Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33885:2943; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33885:2939; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: DAHL MARIE M; DAHL LEONARD V; FOUR BLR DOORS CORP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110070AMT PAID:$410.00NAME:ADELSON, ANTHONY S.ANTHONY S. ANDELSON, P.A. 501 GOLDEN ISLES DR, STEHALLANDALE BEACH FL 33009COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$410.00RECEIPT DATE:04/29/2023REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33684:4515; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less