This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/31/2023 at 13:00:38 (UTC).

VANGUARD HEALTH CENTER CORP. VS THE RESPONSIVE AUTO INSURANCE CO.

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 VANGUARD HEALTH CENTER CORP filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against THE RESPONSIVE AUTO INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VANGUARD HEALTH CENTER CORP.

Assignor

IZQUIERDO, LOURDES

Defendant

THE RESPONSIVE AUTO INSURANCE CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michelle P. Babinksy, Esq

Defendant Attorney

Mahadai, Jennifer, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Motion in Limine

08/01/2023 - Motion in Limine

Motion for Extension of Time

07/03/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Answer and Affirmative Defense

07/28/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

05/29/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Motion for Extension of Time

08/28/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Witness and Exhibit List

08/01/2023 - Witness and Exhibit List

Request for Production

08/01/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

08/01/2023 - Request for Admissions

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

08/01/2023 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Interrogatory

07/31/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Response to Request for Admissions

07/28/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Appearance

07/03/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Service of Process

06/15/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Letter of Correspondence

06/08/2023 - Letter of Correspondence

Request for Admissions

06/08/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

06/08/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

06/08/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Appearance

06/08/2023 - Notice of Appearance

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: VANGUARD HEALTH CENTER CORP.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Witness and Exhibit List; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion in Limine; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: THE RESPONSIVE AUTO INSURANCE CO.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3190466AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:MICHELLE P.BABINKSY, ESQTHE PAREDES BABINSKY LAW FIRM 10 CANAL STREET STEMIAMI SPRINGS FL 33166COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:05/23/2023REGISTER#:319CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3220665AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:MICHELLE P.BABINKSY, ESQTHE PAREDES BABINSKY LAW FIRM 10 CANAL STREET STEMIAMI SPRINGS FL 33166COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:05/20/2023REGISTER#:322CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less