This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/05/2023 at 18:11:39 (UTC).

PEDRO J. GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER OF MIAMI VS 11405 SW 82ND AVE LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/26/2023 PEDRO J GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER OF MIAMI filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against 11405 SW 82ND AVE LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEDRO J. GARCIA, as Property Appraiser of Miami

Defendants

11405 SW 82ND AVE LLC

JIM ZINGALE, as Executive Director of the State of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bonzon-Keenan, Geraldine Teresa

Defendant Attorney

Dennis, Timothy E.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/26/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

07/26/2023 - Complaint

Notice of Interrogatory

07/26/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

07/26/2023 - Request for Production

Lis Pendens

07/26/2023 - Lis Pendens

Notice:

08/17/2023 - Notice:

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

08/22/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/23/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Appearance

08/24/2023 - Notice of Appearance

 

Docket Entries

08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Dennis Timothy E.; JIM ZINGALE as Executive Director of the State of

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: 11405 SW 82ND AVE LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3250176AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:BONZON-KEENAN, GERALDINE TERESA111 NW 1ST ST STE 2800MIAMI FL 33128-1930COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:08/23/2023REGISTER#:325CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090176AMT PAID:$414.00NAME:BONZON-KEENAN, GERALDINE TERESA111 NW 1ST ST STE 2800MIAMI FL 33128-1930COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003142-RECORDING FEE1$8.00$8.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$414.00RECEIPT DATE:07/27/2023REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33819:2835; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less