This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/04/2023 at 06:46:49 (UTC).

A&Y REHABILITATION MEDICAL CENTER, INC. VS PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/27/2023 A Y REHABILITATION MEDICAL CENTER, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-21

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A&Y Rehabilitation Medical Center, Inc.

Assignor

Reyes, Adian

Defendant

Progressive Express Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patino, Richard

Defendant Attorney

Miller, Christina R., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/27/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

02/27/2023 - Complaint

Request for Admissions

02/27/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

02/27/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

02/27/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice:

02/27/2023 - Notice:

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

03/02/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

03/06/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Amended Complaint

03/13/2023 - Amended Complaint

Notice of Appearance

06/21/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

06/21/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Voluntary Dismissal

08/24/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33855:4741; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150064AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:PATINO, RICHARDPATINO LAW FIRM P.O. BOX 133877HIALEAH FL 33013COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:03/04/2023REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: Progressive Express Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3240017AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:PATINO, RICHARDPATINO LAW FIRM P.O. BOX 133877HIALEAH FL 33013COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:03/01/2023REGISTER#:324CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less