This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/17/2023 at 00:28:45 (UTC).

CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC VS SAINTILIA AMELUS ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SAINTILIA AMELUS. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carrington Mortgage Services Llc

Defendants

Amelus, Saintilia

Amelus, Saintillia

Telfort, Niva

Ramblas At Via Ventura Neighborhood Association In

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kopf, Jennifer Lynn

 

Court Documents

Order Extending Time for

01/10/2023 - Order Extending Time for

Answer

01/05/2023 - Answer

Summons Returned - No Service

01/03/2023 - Summons Returned - No Service

Service Returned

01/03/2023 - Service Returned

Service Return for Unknown Party

01/03/2023 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Return for Unknown Party

01/03/2023 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Returned

01/03/2023 - Service Returned

Service Return for Unknown Party

01/03/2023 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Return for Unknown Party

01/03/2023 - Service Return for Unknown Party

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

12/06/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

12/06/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

12/06/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

12/06/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Lis Pendens

11/28/2022 - Lis Pendens

Notice:

11/23/2022 - Notice:

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

11/23/2022 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Complaint

11/23/2022 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/23/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT IS GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Amelus Saintilia; Amelus Saintillia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SAINTILIA AMELUS A/K/A SAINTILLIA AMELUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NIVA TELFORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130075AMT PAID:$1,915.00NAME:KOPF, JENNIFER LYNN2424 N FEDERAL HWY STE 360BOCA RATON FL 33431-7780COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$1,906.00$1,906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$1,915.00RECEIPT DATE:11/29/2022REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33482:2001; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAMBLAS AT VIA VENTURA NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOC INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Carrington Mortgage Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOPF, JENNIFER LYNN