This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/27/2023 at 14:10:32 (UTC).

CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC VS NEVILLE P STRACHAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against NEVILLE P STRACHAN. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC

Defendants

STRACHAN, NEVILLE P

STRACHAN, NEVILLE

STRACHAN, PATRICIA

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Meisels, Jonathan Ian

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/10/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

01/10/2023 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Certificate of Possession of Note

01/10/2023 - Certificate of Possession of Note

Complaint

01/10/2023 - Complaint

Lis Pendens

01/10/2023 - Lis Pendens

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/11/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/11/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/11/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/11/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/12/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/12/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/12/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/12/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3060060AMT PAID:$40.00NAME:MEISELS, JONATHAN IANROBERTSON, ANSCHUTZ, SCHNEID, CRANE & PARTNERS, PLBOCA RATON FL 33487-2853COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$40.00RECEIPT DATE:01/13/2023REGISTER#:306CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 12.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 11. Parties: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: STRACHAN PATRICIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: STRACHAN NEVILLE P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130110AMT PAID:$915.00NAME:MEISELS, JONATHAN IANROBERTSON, ANSCHUTZ, SCHNEID, CRANE & PARTNERS, PLBOCA RATON FL 33487-2853COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$915.00RECEIPT DATE:01/11/2023REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33537:4216; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Possession of Note; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less