This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/23/2023 at 10:15:49 (UTC).

CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC VS BARBARA T RODRIGUEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BARBARA T RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC

Defendants

RODRIGUEZ, BARBARA T

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

MIAMI DADE COUNTY CLERK OF THE COURT

BANK OF AMERICA N A

DISCOVER BANK

BRYANT LAW FIRM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Meisels, Jonathan Ian

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing-

05/18/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Default

05/17/2023 - Default

Service Returned

05/16/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

05/16/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

05/16/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

05/16/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

05/16/2023 - Service Returned

Motion for Default

05/16/2023 - Motion for Default

Service Returned

05/16/2023 - Service Returned

Motion for Default

05/16/2023 - Motion for Default

Notice of Mediation Conference

05/10/2023 - Notice of Mediation Conference

Certificate of Service

04/18/2023 - Certificate of Service

Order Setting CM Deadline

04/17/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties

04/03/2023 - Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties

Affidavit of:

04/03/2023 - Affidavit of:

Answer

03/27/2023 - Answer

Service Return for Unknown Party

03/24/2023 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Returned

03/24/2023 - Service Returned

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: MAY 30, 2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE; MIAMI DADE COUNTY CLERK OF THE COURT; BANK OF AMERICA N A; BRYANT LAW FIRM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3170240AMT PAID:$1,922.50NAME:MEISELS, JONATHAN IANROBERTSON, ANSCHUTZ, SCHNEID, CRANE & PARTNERS, PLBOCA RATON FL 33487-2853COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$1,906.00$1,906.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$7.50$7.503142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$1,922.50RECEIPT DATE:02/25/2023REGISTER#:317CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33595:4775; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Possession of Note; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less