This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/27/2021 at 21:08:34 (UTC).

CAROLINA GRANADOS (PR) ET AL VS JVA ENGINEERING CONTRACTOR INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/03/2020 CAROLINA GRANADOS PR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JVA ENGINEERING CONTRACTOR INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Granados (PR), Carolina

Estate of Javier Granados Lopez

Defendants

JVA Engineering Contractor Inc

BCC Engineering, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ast, Irwin

Defendant Attorneys

Chevres, Jeremy A

Robertson, Neil P

 

Court Documents

Notice of Unavailability/absence

07/13/2021 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Mediators Report

07/12/2021 - Mediators Report

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

07/07/2021 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Notice of Hearing-

07/06/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Filing:

07/06/2021 - Notice of Filing:

Mot to File Amended Complaint

07/06/2021 - Mot to File Amended Complaint

Motion:

07/06/2021 - Motion:

Certificate

07/03/2021 - Certificate

Defendants Certificate of Settlement Authority

07/01/2021 - Defendants Certificate of Settlement Authority

Request for Production

11/04/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Production

11/04/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

11/04/2020 - Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

11/04/2020 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

11/04/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

11/04/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Complaint

11/03/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/03/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/04/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

92 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Mediators Report; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: JULY 22, 2021 AT 9:00 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Mot to File Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT, JVA TO PAY THE REASONABLE EXPENSES INCURRED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Defendants Certificate of Settlement Authority; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BCC ENGINEERING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where JVA ENGINEERING CONTRACTOR, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ast, Irwin