This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/12/2020 at 05:21:02 (UTC).

CAROLINA DUER VS MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 CAROLINA DUER filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-05

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Duer, Carolina

Defendant

Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patrick J Cremeens

Defendant Attorney

Klee, Daniel M., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Notice:

05/12/2020 - Notice:

Response to Request for Admissions

05/12/2020 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

05/12/2020 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

05/12/2020 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Admissions

05/12/2020 - Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Production

05/12/2020 - Response to Request for Production

Motion for Telephonic Hearing

04/08/2020 - Motion for Telephonic Hearing

Notice of Hrg Special Appt

04/08/2020 - Notice of Hrg Special Appt

Request for Production

03/30/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

03/23/2020 - Request for Admissions

Answer and Affirmative Defense

03/23/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Interrogatory

03/23/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Motion:

03/23/2020 - Motion:

Notice of Appearance

03/13/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Service Returned

03/06/2020 - Service Returned

Complaint

02/14/2020 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/17/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/14/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 11:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Granting Telephonic Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: 07/28/20@11:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Klee Daniel M. ESQ; Mercedes-Benz USA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3570158AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:PATRICK J CREMEENS CREMEENS LAW GROUP 5100 WEST KENNEDY BLVD SUITE 27 TAMPA FL 33609 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Mercedes-Benz USA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3480101AMT PAID:$400.00 NAME:PATRICK J CREMEENS CREMEENS LAW GROUP 5100 WEST KENNEDY BLVD SUITE 27 TAMPA FL 33609 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$400.00$400.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.