This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/24/2023 at 13:07:15 (UTC).

CARLOS LINCHENAT VS FLORIDA INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 02/21/2023 CARLOS LINCHENAT filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FLORIDA INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Linchenat, Carlos

Defendants

FLORIDA INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION

AVATAR PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Teresa J Urda

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/21/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

02/21/2023 - Complaint

Notice of Interrogatory

02/21/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

02/21/2023 - Request for Production

Request:

02/21/2023 - Request:

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/22/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/02/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Motion for Extension of Time

04/10/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion:

04/10/2023 - Motion:

Notice of Appearance

04/11/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Compliance

04/11/2023 - Notice of Compliance

Order Setting CM Deadline

04/29/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Notice of Hearing-

05/18/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXTEND MANDATORY STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: JULY 5, 2023 @ 9:30 AM - VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO EXTEND MANDATORY STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: FLORIDA INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3200004AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:TERESA J URDA12595 SW 137TH AVE STE 307MIAMI FL 33186-4222COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:03/02/2023REGISTER#:320CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160068AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:TERESA J URDA12595 SW 137TH AVE STE 307MIAMI FL 33186-4222COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:02/23/2023REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less