This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/04/2021 at 10:02:24 (UTC).

CARLOS HERNANDEZ-EGAS VS FONTAINEBLEAU FLORIDA HOTEL LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 CARLOS HERNANDEZ-EGAS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FONTAINEBLEAU FLORIDA HOTEL LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hernandez-Egas, Carlos

Defendants

Fontainebleau Florida Hotel LLC

Webster, Jacques

CACTUS JACK RECORDS LLC

ABC

DEF

GHI

Cactus Jack Publishing LLC

CACTUS JACK LLC

JKL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hirsch, David L

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/21/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

09/21/2021 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

09/22/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

09/22/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

09/22/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/23/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/23/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/23/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Answer and Affirmative Defense

10/19/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Interrogatory

11/01/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

11/01/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

11/01/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

11/01/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Production

11/01/2021 - Request for Production

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO COMPLAINT Parties: Fontainebleau Florida Hotel LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Webster Jacques

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Fontainebleau Florida Hotel LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 3. Parties: Cactus Jack Publishing LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2990196AMT PAID:$30.00 NAME:HIRSCH, DAVID L 8751 W BROWARD BLVD. SUITE 408 PLANTATION FL 33324 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$30.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/23/2021 REGISTER#:299CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2990004AMT PAID:$411.00 NAME:HIRSCH, DAVID L 8751 W BROWARD BLVD. SUITE 408 PLANTATION FL 33324 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 3102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$411.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/23/2021 REGISTER#:299CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CACTUS JACK RECORDS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where JKL, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where GHI CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where DEF CORP is a litigant