This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 04/12/2023 at 07:20:28 (UTC).

CARLOS GOMEZ CORREA ET AL VS NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 CARLOS GOMEZ CORREA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NATIONAL FIRE MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CORREA, CARLOS GOMEZ

GOMEZ, MARIA DEL PILAR

Defendant

NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Low, David

 

Court Documents

Order of Dismissal

03/22/2023 - Order of Dismissal

Notice:

03/20/2023 - Notice:

Notice:

03/20/2023 - Notice:

Order on Case Management Plan

02/24/2023 - Order on Case Management Plan

Notice of Interrogatory

02/22/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

02/22/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

02/22/2023 - Request for Admissions

Privilege Log

02/20/2023 - Privilege Log

Response to Request for Production

02/20/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Response to Request for Admissions

02/20/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

02/20/2023 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Unavailability/absence

01/23/2023 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

AgreedOrder

01/23/2023 - AgreedOrder

Order Setting CM Deadline

01/09/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Answer and Affirmative Defense

12/23/2022 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Unavailability/absence

12/21/2022 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

12/12/2022 - Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

Notice of Appearance

12/07/2022 - Notice of Appearance

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 33636:1760; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order on Case Management Plan; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Privilege Log; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160119AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:LOW, DAVID2101 WEST COMMERICAL BLVD STE#2800FT LAUDERDALE FL 33309COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:12/03/2022REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080215AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:LOW, DAVID2101 WEST COMMERICAL BLVD STE#2800FT LAUDERDALE FL 33309COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:12/02/2022REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less