This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/26/2023 at 15:30:32 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE (NA) VS VIRGINIA CARBALLO

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 CAPITAL ONE NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VIRGINIA CARBALLO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One (NA)

Defendant

Carballo, Virginia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Thiel Debski

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/25/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

01/25/2023 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

01/30/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/10/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/21/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Answer and Affirmative Defense

03/07/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Service Returned

03/08/2023 - Service Returned

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Carballo Virginia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: Carballo Virginia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3030087AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:MICHAEL THIEL DEBSKIPO BOX 47718JACKSONVILLE FL 32247-7718COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/17/2023REGISTER#:303CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3050118AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:MICHAEL THIEL DEBSKIPO BOX 47718JACKSONVILLE FL 32247-7718COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:01/27/2023REGISTER#:305CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: $10423.60

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less