This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/30/2023 at 03:29:21 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. VS FELIX VALDES

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 CAPITAL ONE, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FELIX VALDES. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One, N.A.

Defendant

Valdes, Felix

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Thiel Debski

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/25/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

01/25/2023 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/27/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/10/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/15/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

03/02/2023 - Service Returned

Order Setting CM Deadline

04/29/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Motion for Default

05/03/2023 - Motion for Default

Motion for Default

05/03/2023 - Motion for Default

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

05/03/2023 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Default

05/04/2023 - Default

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Valdes Felix

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: Valdes Felix

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070043AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:MICHAEL THIEL DEBSKIPO BOX 47718JACKSONVILLE FL 32247-7718COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/15/2023REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3180025AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:MICHAEL THIEL DEBSKIPO BOX 47718JACKSONVILLE FL 32247-7718COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:01/28/2023REGISTER#:318CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less