Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/16/2021 at 22:58:24 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) (NA) VS JOSEPH D TURANO

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOSEPH D TURANO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North Dade Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (USA) (NA)

Defendant

Turano, Joseph D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Thiel Debski

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/23/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

04/23/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

04/15/2021 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Complaint

04/15/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/15/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2630037AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:MICHAEL THIEL DEBSKI PO BOX 47718 JACKSONVILLE FL 32247-7718 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/24/2021 REGISTER#:263CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Turano Joseph D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2660029AMT PAID:$400.00 NAME:MICHAEL THIEL DEBSKI PO BOX 47718 JACKSONVILLE FL 32247-7718 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$400.00$400.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$400.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/17/2021 REGISTER#:266CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: $25396.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Debski, Michael Thiel