This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/27/2022 at 02:13:40 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS HAZEL ROSELL

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HAZEL ROSELL. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-25

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A.

Defendant

Rosell, Hazel

Hialeah, FL 33015-5745

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Spinozza, Kevin

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/19/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

05/19/2022 - Complaint

Email Notice:

05/19/2022 - Email Notice:

Non-Military Affidavit

05/19/2022 - Non-Military Affidavit

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/23/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/24/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

06/13/2022 - Service Returned

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

06/21/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Rosell Hazel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: Rosell Hazel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130192AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:SPINOZZA, KEVIN806 S DOUGLAS RD STE 200CORAL GABLES FL 33134-3157COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:05/24/2022REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100024AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:SPINOZZA, KEVIN806 S DOUGLAS RD STE 200CORAL GABLES FL 33134-3157COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:05/21/2022REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinozza, Kevin