This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/25/2021 at 14:20:49 (UTC).

CAMILO PALACIO VS. TRACY ANN ADDISON

Case Summary

On 02/05/2020 CAMILO PALACIO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TRACY ANN ADDISON. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Joseph Caleb Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-20

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALACIO, CAMILO

Defendant

ADDISON, TRACY ANN

Not Classified By Court

EVICTION PROPERTY ADDRESS

 

Court Documents

Complaint

02/05/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/05/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Answer

02/07/2020 - Answer

Order:

02/10/2020 - Order:

Motion to Strike

02/19/2020 - Motion to Strike

Motion for Default

02/19/2020 - Motion for Default

Service Returned

02/19/2020 - Service Returned

Order of Referral to Mediation Unit

02/27/2020 - Order of Referral to Mediation Unit

Mediators Report

03/12/2020 - Mediators Report

Memorandum of Disposition

03/13/2020 - Memorandum of Disposition

Motion to Disb Crt Reg Monies

03/13/2020 - Motion to Disb Crt Reg Monies

Order to Disburse Court Registry Monies

03/13/2020 - Order to Disburse Court Registry Monies

Order on Motion to Strike

03/13/2020 - Order on Motion to Strike

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Mediation; Hearing Code: MEDIATE; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order on Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND ENTERING DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order to Disburse Court Registry Monies; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Disb Crt Reg Monies; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Mediation; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MEDIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Mediators Report; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Referral to Mediation Unit; Event Type: Event; Comments: 3/13/2020 @ 10A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ADDISON TRACY ANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: AFFT OF NON PAYMENT, NON MILITARY AND COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2820004AMT PAID:$750.00 NAME:TRACEY ANN ADDISON COMMENT:RENT ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2106-COURT REGISTRY DEP1$731.53$731.53 2108-COURT REGISTRY FEE1$18.47$18.47 TENDER TYPE:CASHTENDER AMT:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: REQUIRING DEFT TO DEPOSIT $824 IN COURT REGISTRY BY 3PM ON FEB 12, 2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ADDISON TRACY ANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ADDISON TRACY ANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Dade County Courthouse; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ADDISON TRACY ANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2230033AMT PAID:$195.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:CASHTENDER AMT:$200.00 TENDER TYPE:CHANGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EVICTION PROPERTY ADDRESS is a litigant