This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/30/2023 at 02:39:05 (UTC).

CALIXTO ALFONSO JR DC PA VS IMPERIAL FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 CALIXTO ALFONSO JR DC PA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against IMPERIAL FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIXTO ALFONSO JR DC PA

Assignor

De Leon, July

Defendant

IMPERIAL FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Abraham S. Ovadia, Esq.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/01/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

12/01/2022 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Interrogatory

12/01/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

12/01/2022 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

12/01/2022 - Request for Admissions

Email Notice:

12/01/2022 - Email Notice:

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

12/05/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/05/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/27/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: IMPERIAL FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070045AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ABRAHAM S. OVADIA, ESQ.4800 N FEDERAL HWY STE 204DBOCA RATON FL 33431-3413COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/24/2023REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110079AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:ABRAHAM S. OVADIA, ESQ.4800 N FEDERAL HWY STE 204DBOCA RATON FL 33431-3413COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:12/02/2022REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IMPERIAL FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OVADIA, ABRAHAM