This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 02/02/2020 at 02:18:22 (UTC).

BUTTERFLY REHABILITATION CENTER, INC. VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 BUTTERFLY REHABILITATION CENTER, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUTTERFLY REHABILITATION CENTER, INC.

Assignor

DIAZ, MARIO

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wajih A Shirazi (esq)

Defendant Attorney

Guinea, Ulises A.

 

Court Documents

Motion/petit for Enforcement

07/25/2019 - Motion/petit for Enforcement

Motion/petit for Enforcement

07/25/2019 - Motion/petit for Enforcement

Order on Motion to Compel

07/09/2019 - Order on Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

07/05/2019 - Motion to Compel

Demand for Jury Trial

04/18/2019 - Demand for Jury Trial

Request for Production

04/15/2019 - Request for Production

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

04/15/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Pre Trial Summons

02/22/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

02/05/2019 - Statement of Claim

Order on Motion to Compel

07/09/2019 - Order on Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

07/05/2019 - Motion to Compel

Motion for Extension of Time

05/22/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

04/18/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Email Notice:

04/18/2019 - Email Notice:

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

04/16/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Interrogatory

04/15/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

04/15/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

04/15/2019 - Request for Production

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Substitution of Counsel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion/petit for Enforcement; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion/petit for Enforcement; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Event Type: Event; Comments: DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Event Type: Event; Comments: DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070036AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/22/2019 REGISTER#:307CASHIER:DAVERNF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketSP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3520017AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:WAJIH A SHIRAZI (ESQ) DOS SANTOS & SHIRAZI, LLC 10700 CARIBBEAN BLVD. PE CUTLER BAY FL 33189 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 500.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.