This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/21/2022 at 01:45:06 (UTC).

BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY BANK VS EVELYN MESA

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EVELYN MESA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bureaus Investment Group Portfolio No 15 LLC Assignee Of Comenity Bank

Defendant

Mesa, Evelyn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fagen, Jessica Jo

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/23/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

11/23/2021 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

12/21/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Summons Returned - No Service

01/04/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-7 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2920067AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:12/22/2021REGISTER#:292CASHIER:JT1438

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Mesa Evelyn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100062AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:FAGEN, JESSICA JORAUSCH STURM 100 SECOND AVE S SUITE 3065ST. PETERSBURG FL 33701COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:11/25/2021REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEN , JESSICA J