This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/26/2019 at 10:31:04 (UTC).

BUREAU VERITAS NORTH AMERICA, INC. VS REMINGTON STEEL AND SIGNS, LLC.

Case Summary

On 09/24/2019 BUREAU VERITAS NORTH AMERICA, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against REMINGTON STEEL AND SIGNS, LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUREAU VERITAS NORTH AMERICA, INC.

Defendant

REMINGTON STEEL AND SIGNS, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Singer, Bradley

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover

09/24/2019 - Civil Cover

Complaint

09/24/2019 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

09/25/2019 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/27/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

11/15/2019 - Service Returned

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketService Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Docket20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: REMINGTON STEEL AND SIGNS LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3480225AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:SINGER, BRADLEY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP 2 ALHAMBRA PLA CORAL GABLES FL 33134 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3550114AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:SINGER, BRADLEY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP 2 ALHAMBRA PLA CORAL GABLES FL 33134 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less