This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/14/2019 at 10:05:48 (UTC).

BROWARD INSURANCE RECOVERY CENTER, LLC VS UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 BROWARD INSURANCE RECOVERY CENTER, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWARD INSURANCE RECOVERY CENTER, LLC

Defendant

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Assignee

WESTENDORF, ARTHUR M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Emilio R Stillo

Defendant Attorney

William A Kebler

 

Court Documents

Pre Trial Summons

01/22/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Motion for Default

06/14/2019 - Motion for Default

Request for Production

01/11/2019 - Request for Production

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

03/06/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Appearance

02/06/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Request for Admissions

01/11/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice:

06/17/2019 - Notice:

Request for Production

06/14/2019 - Request for Production

Statement of Claim

01/11/2019 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Service of Process

01/30/2019 - Notice of Service of Process

Memorandum of Disposition

03/11/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2390011AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$120.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/22/2019 REGISTER#:239CASHIER:JT1438

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3480098AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:EMILIO R STILLO 7320 GRIFFIN RD STE 203 DAVIE FL 33314-4105 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 99.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.