Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/14/2021 at 13:05:48 (UTC).

BROWARD INSURANCE RECOVERY CENTER, LLC VS INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 BROWARD INSURANCE RECOVERY CENTER, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Broward Insurance Recovery Center, Llc

Defendant

Infinity Insurance Company

Assignee

Brea, Alejandro

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Emilio R Stillo

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Process

05/14/2021 - Notice of Service of Process

Pre Trial Summons

04/29/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice of Filing:

04/15/2021 - Notice of Filing:

Request for Production

04/15/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

04/15/2021 - Request for Admissions

Statement of Claim

04/15/2021 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/15/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-7 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2170165AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$200.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/29/2021 REGISTER#:217CASHIER:MARTHAV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Infinity Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2670030AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:EMILIO R STILLO 7320 GRIFFIN RD STE 203 DAVIE FL 33314-4105 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/17/2021 REGISTER#:267CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Broward Ins Recovery Center (LLC) is a litigant

Latest cases where INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stillo, Emilio R