This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/07/2020 at 08:48:32 (UTC).

BRIDGEROCK PROPERTIES (LLC) VS L CLAYTON SVCS (LLC)

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 BRIDGEROCK PROPERTIES LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against L CLAYTON SVCS LLC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North Dade Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bridgerock Properties (LLC)

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

L.Clayton Services (LLC)

L Clayton Svcs (LLC)

Not Classified By Court

L. Clayton Sevices LLC

L Clayton Svcs (LLC)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Goldman, Matt D

 

Court Documents

Default Final Judgment

03/17/2020 - Default Final Judgment

Motion for Default Judgment

03/05/2020 - Motion for Default Judgment

Default

03/04/2020 - Default

Motion for Default

03/02/2020 - Motion for Default

Service Returned

02/26/2020 - Service Returned

Complaint

02/14/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/14/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment; Comments: OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31872:2444; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF POSSESSION Parties: L Clayton Svcs (LLC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: L Clayton Svcs (LLC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020021AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CASHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/18/2020 REGISTER#:302CASHIER:DAHOBBS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: L Clayton Svcs (LLC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3460032AMT PAID:$185.00 NAME:GOLDMAN, MATT D 7190 SW 100TH ST PINECREST FL 33156-3069 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$185.00 RECEI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.