This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 02/11/2023 at 15:03:25 (UTC).

BRICKHOUSE INSPECTIONS INC. VS UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/14/2022 BRICKHOUSE INSPECTIONS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brickhouse Inspections Inc.

Defendant

Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Assignee

Mendez, Caridad Gonzalez And Omar

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/14/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

12/14/2022 - Complaint

Email Notice:

12/14/2022 - Email Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

12/14/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

12/14/2022 - Request for Production

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

12/19/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/05/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/09/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120264AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:MICHAEL BIBERMANINSURANCE LITIGATION GROUP, P.A. 1500 NE 162ND STRMIAMI FL 33162-2408COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/06/2023REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070023AMT PAID:$400.00NAME:MICHAEL BIBERMANINSURANCE LITIGATION GROUP, P.A. 1500 NE 162ND STRMIAMI FL 33162-2408COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$400.00$400.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$400.00RECEIPT DATE:12/20/2022REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less