This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/01/2023 at 03:53:07 (UTC).

BRICKHOUSE INSPECTIONS INC. VS UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/15/2022 BRICKHOUSE INSPECTIONS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brickhouse Inspections Inc.

Defendant

Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Assignee

Saintval, Dieu Sauveur Saintval And Venise

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Biberman

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/15/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

12/15/2022 - Statement of Claim

Email Notice:

12/15/2022 - Email Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

12/15/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

12/15/2022 - Request for Production

Memorandum of Disposition

01/23/2023 - Memorandum of Disposition

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

02/06/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2340023AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/09/2023REGISTER#:234CASHIER:LAURAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-7 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3180178AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:MICHAEL BIBERMANINSURANCE LITIGATION GROUP, P.A. 1500 NE 162ND STRMIAMI FL 33162-2408COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:12/17/2022REGISTER#:318CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less