This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/31/2023 at 01:49:31 (UTC).

BRICKHOUSE INSPECTIONS INC. VS CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/04/2023 BRICKHOUSE INSPECTIONS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brickhouse Inspections Inc.

Defendant

Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

Assignee

Gonzalez, Anthony Lopez And Yanet Fabra

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Biberman

Defendant Attorney

Botko, Brad O

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/04/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/04/2023 - Complaint

Email Notice:

01/04/2023 - Email Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

01/04/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

01/04/2023 - Request for Production

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

01/09/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/10/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/13/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

01/20/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Appearance

01/30/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Email Notice:

01/30/2023 - Email Notice:

Answer and Affirmative Defense

02/09/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Response:

02/26/2023 - Response:

Response to Request for Production

03/27/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

03/27/2023 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Taking Video Deposition

05/12/2023 - Notice of Taking Video Deposition

Motion for Summary Judgment

05/15/2023 - Motion for Summary Judgment

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Video Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: BBOTKO@GADCLAW.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110156AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:MICHAEL BIBERMANINSURANCE LITIGATION GROUP, P.A. 1500 NE 162ND STRMIAMI FL 33162-2408COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/13/2023REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120094AMT PAID:$400.00NAME:MICHAEL BIBERMANINSURANCE LITIGATION GROUP, P.A. 1500 NE 162ND STRMIAMI FL 33162-2408COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$400.00$400.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$400.00RECEIPT DATE:01/06/2023REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: $30,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less