This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 02/17/2023 at 18:15:58 (UTC).

BRANDON K DARLING VS IKEA US RETAIL, LLC.

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 BRANDON K DARLING filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against IKEA US RETAIL, LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darling, Brandon K

Defendant

IKEA US RETAIL, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jacob D Maldonado

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/19/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/19/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

12/19/2022 - Complaint

Request for Admissions

12/19/2022 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

12/19/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

12/19/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/19/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/21/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

12/27/2022 - Service Returned

Motion to Dismiss

01/05/2023 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Appearance

01/11/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Email Notice:

01/11/2023 - Email Notice:

Notice of Unavailability/absence

01/13/2023 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

02/06/2023 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Admissions

02/06/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Production

02/07/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Privilege Log

02/07/2023 - Privilege Log

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Privilege Log; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: SERVICE_GAT@RRBPA.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110007AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:JACOB D MALDONADO15055 SW 122ND AVEMIAMI FL 33186-5914COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:12/22/2022REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: IKEA US RETAIL LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080130AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:JACOB D MALDONADO15055 SW 122ND AVEMIAMI FL 33186-5914COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:12/20/2022REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less