This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/14/2021 at 09:45:06 (UTC).

BRANDI HOSKIN VS METRIC ENGINEERING INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/26/2020 BRANDI HOSKIN filed an Other lawsuit against METRIC ENGINEERING INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOSKIN, BRANDI

Defendants

BENITEZ, VICTOR M

METRIC CONSULTING LLC

BENITEZ, MANUEL A

METRIC ENGINEERING INC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

07/23/2020 - Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Request for Production

06/26/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Production

06/26/2020 - Request for Production

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/26/2020 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/29/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/26/2020 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

06/26/2020 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/26/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/29/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Book/Page: 32023:511; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: METRIC ENGINEERING INC; METRIC CONSULTING LLC; BENITEZ VICTOR M; BENITEZ MANUEL A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2560004AMT PAID:$40.00NAME:JOSE O DIAZ (ESQ)1490 W 68TH ST STE 704HIALEAH FL 33014-4590COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$40.00RECEIPT DATE:06/30/2020REGISTER#:256CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: BENITEZ VICTOR M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: METRIC ENGINEERING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2060141AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:JOSE O DIAZ (ESQ)1490 W 68TH ST STE 704HIALEAH FL 33014-4590COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:06/29/2020REGISTER#:206CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Metric Engineering, Inc. is a litigant