This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/29/2022 at 04:47:50 (UTC).

BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA LLC VS CHRISTOPHER RUTHERFORD

Case Summary

On 03/18/2022 BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA LLC filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER RUTHERFORD. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BMW Financial Services NA LLC

Defendant

Rutherford, Christopher

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bloch, Bruce E

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/18/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

03/18/2022 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

03/21/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Order to Show Cause

03/21/2022 - Order to Show Cause

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/23/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

03/28/2022 - Service Returned

Certificate of Service

04/12/2022 - Certificate of Service

Order for Issuance of Writ of Replevin

04/19/2022 - Order for Issuance of Writ of Replevin

Certificate of Service

04/20/2022 - Certificate of Service

Motion for Default

04/26/2022 - Motion for Default

Non-Military Affidavit

04/26/2022 - Non-Military Affidavit

Default

04/27/2022 - Default

Motion for Final Judgment

04/27/2022 - Motion for Final Judgment

Default Final Judgment

05/03/2022 - Default Final Judgment

Certificate of Service

05/04/2022 - Certificate of Service

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Book/Page: 33169:71; Event Type: Event; Comments: IN REPLEVIN. FINAL ORDER AS TO ALL PARTIES SRS #: 12 (OTHER) Parties: Rutherford Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment; Comments: IN REPLEVIN. FINAL ORDER AS TO ALL PARTIES SRS #: 12 (OTHER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Final Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Rutherford Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 10:45AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order for Issuance of Writ of Replevin; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEFERRED.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 3. Parties: Rutherford Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080300AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:BLOCH, BRUCE E9700 S DIXIE HWY STE 1000MIAMI FL 33156-2865COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:03/22/2022REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080053AMT PAID:$486.00NAME:BLOCH, BRUCE E9700 S DIXIE HWY STE 1000MIAMI FL 33156-2865COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003134-WRIT (GARD) ADD FE1$85.00$85.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$486.00RECEIPT DATE:03/22/2022REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Change UCR Non Jury Characteristic; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order to Show Cause; Event Type: Event; Comments: REPLEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRUCE E BLOCH, ESQ