This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 12/25/2022 at 08:03:50 (UTC).

BLUE NATIVE OF THE FLORIDA KEYS, INC., VS OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/16/2022 BLUE NATIVE OF THE FLORIDA KEYS, INC , filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLUE NATIVE OF THE FLORIDA KEYS, INC.,

Defendant

OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peterson, Michael P.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/16/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

11/16/2022 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/17/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/18/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

11/28/2022 - Service Returned

Notice of Appearance

12/12/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Order Extending Time for

12/13/2022 - Order Extending Time for

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT-AGREED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100192AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:PETERSON, MICHAEL P.8000 SW 117TH AVE STE 206MIAMI FL 33183-4809COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:11/18/2022REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160335AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:PETERSON, MICHAEL P.8000 SW 117TH AVE STE 206MIAMI FL 33183-4809COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:11/17/2022REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peterson, Michael P.