This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/06/2020 at 09:54:28 (UTC).

BLANKENSHIP, ROBERT VS BLANKENSHIP, LOREANA

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 BLANKENSHIP, ROBERT filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BLANKENSHIP, LOREANA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Blankenship, Robert

Respondent

Blankenship, Loreana

Minors

B, N L

B, S P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Baird, Lisa A.

Respondent Attorney

Alfonso, Arturo R.

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment

02/04/2020 - Final Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Uncontested Calendar; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 11:00AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-5 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31813:3426; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Completion of Parenting Class; Event Type: Event; Comments: LOREANA BLAMKENSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uncontested Calendar; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Withdraw; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PETITIONER'S CERTIFICATE OF PARENTING CLASS (ATTACHED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing Child Support Guidelines Worksheet Attached; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: LOREANA BLANKENSIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 2-4-20 11AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON RESPONDENT/WIFE'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE,ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3510030AMT PAID:$409.00 NAME:BAIRD, LISA A. 10271 SUNSET DR STE 103 MIAMI FL 33173 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$409.00 RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) ESummons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Petitioner - Child Custody Jurisdiction; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing and Serving Administrative Order; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Limited Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.