This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/16/2021 at 01:36:01 (UTC).

BLANCA DJABALI VS MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 BLANCA DJABALI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MIAMI-DADE COUNTY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DJABALI, BLANCA

Defendant

MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William C Robinson

Defendant Attorneys

Lepore Korissa

Cohen, Nykeah L

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing-

10/14/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion to Compel

10/13/2021 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

10/12/2021 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

10/12/2021 - Response to Request for Production

Certificate of No Objections to Production

10/05/2021 - Certificate of No Objections to Production

Notice of Production

10/03/2021 - Notice of Production

Response to Request for Production

09/29/2021 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

09/29/2021 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

09/21/2021 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Taking Video Deposition

09/21/2021 - Notice of Taking Video Deposition

Notice of Interrogatory

09/20/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Answer and Affirmative Defense

09/20/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Request for Production

09/08/2021 - Request for Production

Service Returned

09/03/2021 - Service Returned

Notice of Appearance

08/31/2021 - Notice of Appearance

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/12/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

08/11/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

08/11/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON NOVEMBER 18, 2021 AT 9AM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event; Comments: DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of No Objections to Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Cohen Nykeah L; MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020022AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:WILLIAM C ROBINSON PO BOX 610575 NORTH MIAMI FL 33261-0575 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:08/13/2021 REGISTER#:302CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2970168AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:WILLIAM C ROBINSON PO BOX 610575 NORTH MIAMI FL 33261-0575 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:08/12/2021 REGISTER#:297CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Miami Dade County Fire Rescue is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cohen, Nykeah L