This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/30/2022 at 15:02:30 (UTC).

BIG LIGAS, LLC VS PAULO EZEQUIEL LONDRA

Case Summary

On 03/05/2020 BIG LIGAS, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PAULO EZEQUIEL LONDRA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BIG LIGAS, LLC

Defendant

LONDRA, PAULO EZEQUIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Sammataro, James G

Cuza, Jesus

Wolfe, Richard C.

Isaac J Mitrani

 

Court Documents

Response to Request for Admissions

05/19/2020 - Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Production

10/05/2020 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

08/27/2020 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

06/24/2020 - Request for Admissions

Answer and Third Party Complaint

04/17/2020 - Answer and Third Party Complaint

Request for Production

08/28/2020 - Request for Production

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

08/27/2020 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Reply to Answer

04/17/2020 - Reply to Answer

Notice of Interrogatory

05/20/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Mediators Report

06/25/2020 - Mediators Report

Request for Admissions

06/24/2020 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

06/24/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Response to Request for Production

06/16/2020 - Response to Request for Production

Order:

06/05/2020 - Order:

Notice of Service of Process

06/01/2020 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Mediation Conference

05/29/2020 - Notice of Mediation Conference

Response to Request for Production

05/28/2020 - Response to Request for Production

Notice:

05/26/2020 - Notice:

308 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: 3RD DCA ORDER RECOGNIZING APPELLANT'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Requiring:; Event Type: Event; Comments: THE CLERK OF COURTS TO CLOSE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: 3RD DCA ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ABATE APPEAL, ETC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Trial Minutes; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulation for Dismissal; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RETURNING OF EXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Text; Event Type: Event; Comments: JUROR QUESTIONNAIRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Law; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 11:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
316 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON MOTIONS AND MEMO REQUIREMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply to Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Third Party Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: (CHRISTIAN ANDRES SALAZAR) Parties: LONDRA PAULO EZEQUIEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Third Party Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: (DANIEL ECHAVARRIA OVIEDO) Parties: LONDRA PAULO EZEQUIEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2790001AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:WOLFE, RICHARD C.175 SW 7TH ST STE 2410MIAMI FL 33130-2966COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:03/18/2020REGISTER#:279CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BIG LIGAS, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sammataro, James G

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cuza, Jesus

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wolfe, Richard C.