This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 12/31/2022 at 10:56:15 (UTC).

BHARAT DESAI ET AL VS PEDRO J GARCIA AS PROPERTY APPRAISER ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 BHARAT DESAI filed an Other lawsuit against PEDRO J GARCIA AS PROPERTY APPRAISER. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Desai, Bharat

Sethi, Neerja

Defendants

Pedro J Garcia as Property Appraiser

Peter Cam as Tax Collector

Jim Zingale as Executive Director of the FL DOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert E V Kelley Jr

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/19/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

12/19/2022 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/23/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/23/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/27/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/27/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Affidavit of Service

12/28/2022 - Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service

12/28/2022 - Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service

12/29/2022 - Affidavit of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: Peter Cam as Tax Collector

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Pedro J Garcia as Property Appraiser

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3050241AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:ROBERT E V KELLEY JRPO BOX 2231TAMPA FL 33601-2231COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:12/24/2022REGISTER#:305CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3060103AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:ROBERT E V KELLEY JRPO BOX 2231TAMPA FL 33601-2231COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:12/21/2022REGISTER#:306CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less