This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/07/2020 at 01:31:19 (UTC).

BERNARDO ESCOBIO VS WILFREDO TORRES ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 BERNARDO ESCOBIO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WILFREDO TORRES. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Escobio, Bernardo

Defendants

Torres, Wilfredo

Lopez, Yamileth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ast, Irwin

Defendant Attorneys

Grigsby, Andrew E, Jr

Torrente, Anthony

 

Court Documents

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

06/09/2020 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Jury Trial

05/22/2020 - Notice of Jury Trial

Certificate of No Objections to Production

04/01/2020 - Certificate of No Objections to Production

Notice of Production

03/20/2020 - Notice of Production

Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

02/18/2020 - Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

02/13/2020 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

02/06/2020 - Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Taking Deposition

02/05/2020 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Response to Request for Admissions

01/17/2020 - Response to Request for Admissions

Request for Production

01/10/2020 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

01/10/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Service Returned

12/17/2019 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/26/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/22/2019 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Notice of Interrogatory

11/18/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

11/18/2019 - Request for Admissions

Complaint

11/18/2019 - Complaint

Civil Cover

11/18/2019 - Civil Cover

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of No Objections to Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3560058AMT PAID:$20.00 NAME:AST, IRWIN IRWINAST PA 2121 SW 3RD AVE SUITE 401 MIAMI FL 33129-2065 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3600378AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:AST, IRWIN IRWINAST PA 2121 SW 3RD AVE SUITE 401 MIAMI FL 33129-2065 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.